THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:58:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 33931
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jiang (CPSO#: 109586 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 33931
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jiang (CPSO#: 109586 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENGZHU JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENGZHU JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016