THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
3400 ON-144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058551018
Fax: 7058559007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilder Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leduc (CPSO#: 109605 )
Business Address: 3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
7058551018 Extn: 613

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
3400 ON-144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058551018
Fax: 7058559007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilder Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leduc (CPSO#: 109605 )
Business Address: 3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
7058551018 Extn: 613

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILDER LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILDER LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016