THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Ottawa Medical Centre
1650 Queensdale Avenue, Unit 2
Ottawa Ontario K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
Address: Sexual Health Clinic
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: 613-560-6096
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: 613-225-9736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elise Azzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Azzi (CPSO#: 109615 )
Business Address: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
613-244-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Ottawa Medical Centre
1650 Queensdale Avenue, Unit 2
Ottawa Ontario K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
Address: Sexual Health Clinic
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: 613-560-6096
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Cres
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Ottawa ON K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: 613-225-9736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elise Azzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Azzi (CPSO#: 109615 )
Business Address: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
613-244-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE AZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE AZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016