THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3131 Line 8
The Elden of Bradford
Bradford West Gwillimbury Ontario L3Z 2A5
Phone: 905-775-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Reactivation Care Centre - Finch
Southlake Regional Health Centre
2111 Finch Ave W
North York Ontario M3N 1N1
Phone: 416-747-3211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liu (CPSO#: 109654 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058954521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3131 Line 8
The Elden of Bradford
Bradford West Gwillimbury Ontario L3Z 2A5
Phone: 905-775-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Reactivation Care Centre - Finch
Southlake Regional Health Centre
2111 Finch Ave W
North York Ontario M3N 1N1
Phone: 416-747-3211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liu (CPSO#: 109654 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058954521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016