THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:53:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 170 Simcoe St
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 705-748-5632
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500-185 King St
Peterborough ON K9J 2R8
Phone: 7057485632
Fax: 6474983221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sundareswaran and Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moore (CPSO#: 109655 ) Dr. M. Sundareswaran (CPSO#: 109657 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 170 Simcoe St
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 705-748-5632
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500-185 King St
Peterborough ON K9J 2R8
Phone: 7057485632
Fax: 6474983221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sundareswaran and Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moore (CPSO#: 109655 ) Dr. M. Sundareswaran (CPSO#: 109657 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADURA SUNDARESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARESWARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADURA SUNDARESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016