THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Family Medicine, Hospitalist
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Hospital
Family Medicine
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Hongyi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liu (CPSO#: 109664 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 15-3305 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007

Corporation Name: Helena Hongyi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Family Medicine, Hospitalist
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Hospital
Family Medicine
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Hongyi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liu (CPSO#: 109664 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 15-3305 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007

Corporation Name: Helena Hongyi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA HONGYI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA HONGYI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016