THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:40:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 4A3
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 688-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sun (CPSO#: 109675 )
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
(905) 889-1125
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 4A3
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 688-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sun (CPSO#: 109675 )
Business Address: 7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4A3
(905) 889-1125
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA YI-CHAN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA YI-CHAN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016