THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apoorv Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain (CPSO#: 109694 )
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7580
Business Address: 1000 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Address: 343 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apoorv Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain (CPSO#: 109694 )
Business Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7580
Business Address: 1000 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Address: 343 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APOORV ALANKAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APOORV ALANKAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016