THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-481 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 928 0217
Fax: 416 964 1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Babak Aberumand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Aberumand (CPSO#: 109709 )
Business Address: 2-481 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1X9
(416) 928-0217

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-481 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 928 0217
Fax: 416 964 1815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Babak Aberumand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Aberumand (CPSO#: 109709 )
Business Address: 2-481 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M5S 1X9
(416) 928-0217

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ABERUMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABERUMAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ABERUMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABERUMAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016