THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:54:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
111 Main Street West
North Bay
Ontario
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 497-0424
Fax: (705)497-0968
Address: St Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A1X2
Phone: 705-848-7181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Hospital
50 College Road
North Bay
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: 7057533110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Z. Toth Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Toth (CPSO#: 109728 )
Business Address: 150 Ontario Avenue
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1Y3

Corporation Name: Dr Zsolt Toth Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Toth (CPSO#: 109728 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Zsolt Toth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
111 Main Street West
North Bay
Ontario
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 497-0424
Fax: (705)497-0968
Address: St Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A1X2
Phone: 705-848-7181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Hospital
50 College Road
North Bay
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: 7057533110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Z. Toth Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Toth (CPSO#: 109728 )
Business Address: 150 Ontario Avenue
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1Y3

Corporation Name: Dr Zsolt Toth Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Toth (CPSO#: 109728 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Zsolt Toth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZSOLT TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZSOLT TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016