THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:59:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Ottawa Ontario K1C1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138301298
Fax: 6138302170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VÉRONIQUE G. DUCHESNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Duchesne (CPSO#: 109731 )
Business Address: 2555 Saint Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6

Corporation Name: VÉRONIQUE G. DUCHESNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Ottawa Ontario K1C1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138301298
Fax: 6138302170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VÉRONIQUE G. DUCHESNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Duchesne (CPSO#: 109731 )
Business Address: 2555 Saint Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6

Corporation Name: VÉRONIQUE G. DUCHESNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VÉRONIQUE G DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VÉRONIQUE G DUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016