THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:58:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
General Site
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 112-17730 Leslie St
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 2898039119
Extension: 2
Fax: 9052351277
Address: 716-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4164632438
Fax: 4164632526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeyu Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Li (CPSO#: 109735 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164382911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
General Site
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 112-17730 Leslie St
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 2898039119
Extension: 2
Fax: 9052351277
Address: 716-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4164632438
Fax: 4164632526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeyu Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Li (CPSO#: 109735 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
4164382911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEYU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEYU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016