THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:57:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neila Bazaracai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bazaracai (CPSO#: 109738 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neila Bazaracai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bazaracai (CPSO#: 109738 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEILA BAZARACAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZARACAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEILA BAZARACAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZARACAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016