THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 804 9050
Fax: 519 804 9046
Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
Phone: 226 338 5942
Fax: 519 578 9804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Brewster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brewster (CPSO#: 109757 )
Business Address: E-16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
519 804 9324
Business Address: 16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 804 9050
Fax: 519 804 9046
Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
Phone: 226 338 5942
Fax: 519 578 9804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Brewster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brewster (CPSO#: 109757 )
Business Address: E-16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
519 804 9324
Business Address: 16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LEE BREWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREWSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LEE BREWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREWSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016