THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamanna Chibber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chibber (CPSO#: 109761 )
Business Address: 32 Wellsprings Drive
Brampton Ontario L6V 4S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamanna Chibber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chibber (CPSO#: 109761 )
Business Address: 32 Wellsprings Drive
Brampton Ontario L6V 4S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMANNA CHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMANNA CHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016