THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Garafraxa St
Fergus Ontario N1M 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-383-3333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thompson (CPSO#: 109775 )
Business Address: 500 Garafraxa Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1E8
(226) 383-3333
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Garafraxa St
Fergus Ontario N1M 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-383-3333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thompson (CPSO#: 109775 )
Business Address: 500 Garafraxa Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1E8
(226) 383-3333
Business Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W3
(519) 843-2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA NICOLE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA NICOLE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016