THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
University Health Network
700U, 7th floor
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 3237
Fax: 416-946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Long Viet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nguyen (CPSO#: 109785 )
Business Address: 700-3100 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 8T3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
University Health Network
700U, 7th floor
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 3237
Fax: 416-946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Long Viet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nguyen (CPSO#: 109785 )
Business Address: 700-3100 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 8T3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LONG VIET NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LONG VIET NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016