THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:23:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737 8899
Extension: 79939
Fax: 613 739 6662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CIPKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cipkar (CPSO#: 109792 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8899 Extn: 79939

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737 8899
Extension: 79939
Fax: 613 739 6662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CIPKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cipkar (CPSO#: 109792 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8899 Extn: 79939

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CIPKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CIPKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016