THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:46:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097288459
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.P. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Howard (CPSO#: 109795 )
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
17097288459

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097288459
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.P. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Howard (CPSO#: 109795 )
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
17097288459

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PATRICK HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS PATRICK HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016