THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:39:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Unit 134
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 291 4506
Fax: 905 228 4111

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZAMIR MERALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Merali (CPSO#: 109818 )
Business Address: 81 Navy Wharf Court
3716
Toronto Ontario M5V 3S2
6478256013
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
134
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
19052914506

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Unit 134
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 291 4506
Fax: 905 228 4111

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZAMIR MERALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Merali (CPSO#: 109818 )
Business Address: 81 Navy Wharf Court
3716
Toronto Ontario M5V 3S2
6478256013
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
134
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
19052914506

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAMIR MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAMIR MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016