THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Emergency Department
Ground floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Scott McGilvray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. McGilvray (CPSO#: 109826 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
6472278466

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Emergency Department
Ground floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Scott McGilvray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. McGilvray (CPSO#: 109826 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
6472278466

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN SCOTT MCGILVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILVRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN SCOTT MCGILVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILVRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016