THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:11:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: China Medical University College of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Integrated Schizophrenia Program / Youth
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.C. HSIEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsieh (CPSO#: 109837 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
6137226521 Extn: 6533

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: China Medical University College of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Integrated Schizophrenia Program / Youth
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.C. HSIEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsieh (CPSO#: 109837 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
6137226521 Extn: 6533

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TI-CHEN HSIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TI-CHEN HSIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: China Medical University College of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016