THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:31:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. D. HORTH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Horth (CPSO#: 109849 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
905-522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. D. HORTH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Horth (CPSO#: 109849 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
905-522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILLON ALAN HORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILLON ALAN HORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016