THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Madzima, Tina Rutendo (Used Until: 18 Jan 2022)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
University of Toronto
263 McCaul Street, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5T1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416- 978-6801
Fax: 416-978-6915

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Madzima, Tina Rutendo (Used Until: 18 Jan 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
University of Toronto
263 McCaul Street, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5T1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416- 978-6801
Fax: 416-978-6915

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA RUTENDO OLIPHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIPHANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA RUTENDO OLIPHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIPHANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016