THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 380 Hunt Club Rd
Vital Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132481010
Fax: 6132481019
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 6132572200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reetesh Bose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bose (CPSO#: 109903 )
Business Address: 224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
6132481010
Business Address: 380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613-248-1010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 380 Hunt Club Rd
Vital Medical Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132481010
Fax: 6132481019
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 6132572200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reetesh Bose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bose (CPSO#: 109903 )
Business Address: 224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
6132481010
Business Address: 380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613-248-1010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REETESH BOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REETESH BOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016