THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:47:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anand (CPSO#: 109912 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
4165306563

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anand (CPSO#: 109912 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
4165306563

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016