THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61 Queen St E
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
2nd Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Suite B07
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 6120
Fax: 416-292-9678
Address: Upper-38 Regent St
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Child Development Clinic
Upper Level
Toronto ON M5A 3N7
Phone: (416) 362-0805
Fax: (416) 362-5899
Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: 4164382911
Extension: 6120
Fax: 6472514732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Archer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Archer (CPSO#: 109937 )
Business Address: 61 Queen Street East
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
416-867-3655
Business Address: 38 Regent Street
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Child Development Clinic
Upper Level
Toronto Ontario M5A 3N7
(416) 362-0805
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B07
Scarborough Kids Development Clinic
Scarborough General Hospital, Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-438-2911 Extn: 6120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61 Queen St E
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
2nd Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Suite B07
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 6120
Fax: 416-292-9678
Address: Upper-38 Regent St
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Child Development Clinic
Upper Level
Toronto ON M5A 3N7
Phone: (416) 362-0805
Fax: (416) 362-5899
Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Phone: 4164382911
Extension: 6120
Fax: 6472514732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Archer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Archer (CPSO#: 109937 )
Business Address: 61 Queen Street East
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
416-867-3655
Business Address: 38 Regent Street
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Child Development Clinic
Upper Level
Toronto Ontario M5A 3N7
(416) 362-0805
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B07
Scarborough Kids Development Clinic
Scarborough General Hospital, Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
416-438-2911 Extn: 6120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ELISE ARCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ELISE ARCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016