THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:22:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Barrie St
Division of Palliative Medicine
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston ON K7L 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-2485
Fax: 613-548-2436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majid Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Iqbal (CPSO#: 109945 )
Business Address: 34 Barrie St
Kingston ON K7L 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Barrie St
Division of Palliative Medicine
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston ON K7L 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-2485
Fax: 613-548-2436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majid Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Iqbal (CPSO#: 109945 )
Business Address: 34 Barrie St
Kingston ON K7L 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID IQBAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IQBAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID IQBAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IQBAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016