THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:38:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
CHEST Centre
2nd Floor
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-7777
Fax: 416-469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vicky Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Cheng (CPSO#: 109946 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
CHEST Centre
2nd Floor
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-7777
Fax: 416-469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vicky Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Cheng (CPSO#: 109946 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICKY YINYEE CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICKY YINYEE CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016