THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 905-521-4971
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 05 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMUEL WASERMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waserman (CPSO#: 109951 )
Business Address: 905-521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 905-521-4971
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 05 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMUEL WASERMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waserman (CPSO#: 109951 )
Business Address: 905-521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL BENJAMIN GEORGE WASERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL BENJAMIN GEORGE WASERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 10 Nov 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016