THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:59:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Divsion of Clinical Neurological
Sciences
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SEBASTIAN FRIDMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fridman (CPSO#: 109982 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
Suite B10-004
London ON N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Divsion of Clinical Neurological
Sciences
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SEBASTIAN FRIDMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fridman (CPSO#: 109982 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
Suite B10-004
London ON N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Feb 2025
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 21 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Sebastian Fridman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical
Neurological Science, Division of Neurology, University of Western
Ontario, in which Dr. Fridman holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Fridman no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Fridman's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Fridman's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 17, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Fridman's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Sebastian Fridman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Clinical
Neurological Science, Division of Neurology, University of Western
Ontario, in which Dr. Fridman holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Fridman no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Fridman's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Fridman's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 17, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Fridman's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016