THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Istanbul University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 6967058
Fax: (613)6967080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Turkey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alper Aydin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aydin (CPSO#: 109989 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH
Medical School: Istanbul University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 6967058
Fax: (613)6967080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Turkey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alper Aydin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aydin (CPSO#: 109989 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Mar 2021
31 Mar 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 31 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Alper Aydin may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Aydin
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Aydin no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2018, and expires on March 31, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Aydin's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa,
the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Alper Aydin may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Aydin
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Aydin no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2018, and expires on March 31, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Aydin's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa,
the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Istanbul University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Mar 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016