THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:21:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 659 Dundas St.
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642-1532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chevy Priyadamkol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Priyadamkol (CPSO#: 109995 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 659 Dundas St.
London Ontario N5W 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642-1532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chevy Priyadamkol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Priyadamkol (CPSO#: 109995 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHEVY PRIYADAMKOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIYADAMKOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHEVY PRIYADAMKOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIYADAMKOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016