THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:52:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St.
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Phone: (705) 356-2265
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Fortino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fortino (CPSO#: 110009 )
Business Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 525 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-2265

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St.
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Phone: (705) 356-2265
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Fortino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fortino (CPSO#: 110009 )
Business Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 525 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-2265

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS FORTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS FORTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016