THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-453
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre, Unity Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 206
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine B. Soucie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Soucie (CPSO#: 110010 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-453
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre, Unity Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 206
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine B. Soucie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Soucie (CPSO#: 110010 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE BERENGERE SOUCIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE BERENGERE SOUCIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016