THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19-6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162978362
Fax: 4168408434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kapralik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kapralik (CPSO#: 110011 )
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
6139794934

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19-6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162978362
Fax: 4168408434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kapralik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kapralik (CPSO#: 110011 )
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
6139794934

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA LAUREN JANZ KAPRALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA LAUREN JANZ KAPRALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016