THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 866-469-0822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hooman Hennessey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hennessey (CPSO#: 110036 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Medical Imaging
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 866-469-0822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hooman Hennessey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hennessey (CPSO#: 110036 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOOMAN HENNESSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNESSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOOMAN HENNESSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNESSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016