THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Parkdale Avenue
4th Floor Dermatology
Mohs Surgery Unit
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4069
Fax: (613) 761-4194
Address: 1600 Carling Avenue
Suite 650
Victoria Park Medispa
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 1G3
Phone: 613-722-4436
Fax: 613-722-2877
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 613-247-3525
Fax: 613-247-3516

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lim (CPSO#: 110061 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
4th Floor Dermatology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Parkdale Avenue
4th Floor Dermatology
Mohs Surgery Unit
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4069
Fax: (613) 761-4194
Address: 1600 Carling Avenue
Suite 650
Victoria Park Medispa
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 1G3
Phone: 613-722-4436
Fax: 613-722-2877
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 613-247-3525
Fax: 613-247-3516

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lim (CPSO#: 110061 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
4th Floor Dermatology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN ME-YOUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN ME-YOUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016