THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:47:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. INDRANEEL KARNIK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Karnik (CPSO#: 110068 )
Business Address: 2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
905-279-1700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. INDRANEEL KARNIK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Karnik (CPSO#: 110068 )
Business Address: 2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
905-279-1700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDRANEEL SANJAY KARNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARNIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDRANEEL SANJAY KARNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARNIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016