THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:04:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Hastings Family Health Team
Marmora Medical Centre
Box 520
1 Madoc St
Marmora Ontario K0K 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 472-6131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Payman Charkhzarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Charkhzarin (CPSO#: 110094 )
Business Address: 1 Madoc Street
Marmora Ontario K0K 2M0

Corporation Name: Dr. Payman Charkhzarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central Hastings Family Health Team
Marmora Medical Centre
Box 520
1 Madoc St
Marmora Ontario K0K 2M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 472-6131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Payman Charkhzarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Charkhzarin (CPSO#: 110094 )
Business Address: 1 Madoc Street
Marmora Ontario K0K 2M0

Corporation Name: Dr. Payman Charkhzarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAYMAN CHARKHZARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARKHZARIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAYMAN CHARKHZARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARKHZARIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016