THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5130
Fax: 905-813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary B. Mahler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahler (CPSO#: 110110 )
Business Address: 155 Avondale Crt
Burlington ON L7L 2M8
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5130
Fax: 905-813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary B. Mahler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahler (CPSO#: 110110 )
Business Address: 155 Avondale Crt
Burlington ON L7L 2M8
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY BERNADETTE MAHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY BERNADETTE MAHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016