THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:19:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 626-8563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Reid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reid (CPSO#: 110114 )
Business Address: Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Avenue
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 626-8563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Reid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reid (CPSO#: 110114 )
Business Address: Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Avenue
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE MARY REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE MARY REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016