THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kanazawa University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fujii Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fujii (CPSO#: 110226 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE
Medical School: Kanazawa University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fujii Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fujii (CPSO#: 110226 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SATORU FUJII may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SATORU FUJII may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kanazawa University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016