THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 254-0210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman St
Bluewater Health
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (226) 254-0210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ADETUNJI ADENIYI OREMAKINDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oremakinde (CPSO#: 110243 )
Business Address: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
2262540210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 254-0210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Norman St
Bluewater Health
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (226) 254-0210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ADETUNJI ADENIYI OREMAKINDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oremakinde (CPSO#: 110243 )
Business Address: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
2262540210

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETUNJI ADENIYI OREMAKINDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREMAKINDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETUNJI ADENIYI OREMAKINDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREMAKINDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016