THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:47:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 21 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vibhuti Kalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kalia (CPSO#: 110249 )
Business Address: 2302 Waterside Terr
London ON N6G 0M1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 21 Oct 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vibhuti Kalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kalia (CPSO#: 110249 )
Business Address: 2302 Waterside Terr
London ON N6G 0M1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Feb 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 16 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VIBHUTI KALIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Diagnostic Radiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. KALIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on 30 June, 2022, or when Dr. KALIA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KALIA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KALIA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on March 8, 2021, and expires on June 30, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Kalia’s academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. VIBHUTI KALIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Diagnostic Radiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. KALIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on 30 June, 2022, or when Dr. KALIA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KALIA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KALIA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on March 8, 2021, and expires on June 30, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Kalia’s academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016