THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 625 Runnymede Road
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167627316
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Sindhu Mathews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mathews (CPSO#: 110326 )
Business Address: 1-200 Fletcher Cres
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Health Records
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
705-435-6281
Business Address: 625 Runnymede Road
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 625 Runnymede Road
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167627316
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Sindhu Mathews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mathews (CPSO#: 110326 )
Business Address: 1-200 Fletcher Cres
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Health Records
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
705-435-6281
Business Address: 625 Runnymede Road
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SINDHU MATHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEWS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SINDHU MATHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEWS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016