THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:09:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morrison-Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Morrison-Levy (CPSO#: 110337 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Science Center
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-549-6666 Extn: 3808

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morrison-Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Morrison-Levy (CPSO#: 110337 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Science Center
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-549-6666 Extn: 3808

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Aug 2020
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 17 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nadine St Clare Morrison-Levy may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Morrison-Levy holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Morrison-Levy no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Morrison-Levy's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Morrison-Levy's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 17, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Morrison-Levy's academic appointment at
Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nadine St Clare Morrison-Levy may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Morrison-Levy holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Morrison-Levy no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Morrison-Levy's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Morrison-Levy's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 17, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Morrison-Levy's academic appointment at
Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016