THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GALI SHAPIRA ZALTSBERG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shapira Zaltsberg (CPSO#: 110374 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GALI SHAPIRA ZALTSBERG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shapira Zaltsberg (CPSO#: 110374 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Apr 2023
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 27 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gali Shapira Zaltsberg may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Diagnostic Radiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Shapira
Zaltsberg holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Shapira Zaltsberg no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Shapira
Zaltsberg's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Shapira Zaltsberg's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gali Shapira Zaltsberg may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Diagnostic Radiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Shapira
Zaltsberg holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Shapira Zaltsberg no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Shapira
Zaltsberg's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Shapira Zaltsberg's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016