THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W. Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 647-971-1906
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yedishtra Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Naidoo (CPSO#: 110423 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W. Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 647-971-1906
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yedishtra Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Naidoo (CPSO#: 110423 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEDISHTRA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEDISHTRA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016