THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:31:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-121 Charles St W
Kitchener Pain Clinic
Unit 120
Kitchener ON N2G 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-894-4542
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G7
Phone: 2892749441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Calvin Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan (CPSO#: 110438 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic Courtice Health Centre
1450 Durham Regional Hwy 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 206-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
905 623 5679

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-121 Charles St W
Kitchener Pain Clinic
Unit 120
Kitchener ON N2G 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-894-4542
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G7
Phone: 2892749441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Calvin Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan (CPSO#: 110438 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic Courtice Health Centre
1450 Durham Regional Hwy 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 206-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
905 623 5679

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN CHI HUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN CHI HUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016